+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 56, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--George, Girod, Whitsett; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Tomei, Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 3--Gilliam, Sprenger, Whitsett.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #3612
2/24/2014 12:34:57 PM
Amendment #3602
2/24/2014 8:57:41 AM
Amendment #3543
2/20/2014 10:13:48 AM
Amendment #3092
2/5/2014 12:54:06 PM
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor