+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to refer to Rules carried by voice vote.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
- Work Session held.
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Thompson. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 4--Barnhart, Hicks, Holvey, Williamson; Absent, 1--Conger; Excused, 2--Hanna, Richardson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (11)
Amendment #3625
2/25/2014 7:41:33 AM
Amendment #3582
2/21/2014 3:05:50 PM
Amendment #3532
2/19/2014 5:52:20 PM
Amendment #3513
2/19/2014 1:51:20 PM
Amendment #3262
2/10/2014 8:07:45 AM
Amendment #3263
2/10/2014 8:07:45 AM
Amendment #3261
2/10/2014 8:07:01 AM
Amendment #3250
2/10/2014 4:20:09 PM
Amendment #3170
2/10/2014 8:07:45 AM
Amendment #3171
2/10/2014 8:07:45 AM
Amendment #3168
2/10/2014 8:07:01 AM
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor