+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 90, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 53; Nays, 6--Kennemer, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Sprenger; Excused, 1--Hayden.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Taken from 02-28 Calendar and placed on 03-01 Calendar on voice vote.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government and Accountability.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Wilson; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -3
Adopted (2/22/2018 2:51 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/8/2018 10:49 AM)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor