+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, be referred to Rules, and then referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (10)
Amendment -B20
Adopted (2/27/2020 9:03 PM)
Amendment -A17
Proposed (2/21/2020 12:37 PM)
Amendment -A10
Combined (2/20/2020 12:09 PM)
Amendment -A18
Combined (2/21/2020 3:26 PM)
Amendment -A19
Adopted (2/24/2020 1:09 PM)
Amendment -A9
Combined (2/20/2020 12:09 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:26 PM)
Amendment -6
Adopted (2/12/2020 4:12 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/11/2020 12:09 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/10/2020 2:04 PM)