+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 5, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 1, 2016.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 25; excused, 5--Boquist, Shields, Thatcher, Whitsett, Winters.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Health Care.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/1/2016 10:44:15 AM)
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor