+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 24--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Buehler, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Helfrich, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Vial, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Stark.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/13/2018 10:09 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/9/2018 4:48 PM)