+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 48, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Boquist, Kruse.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.