+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 54, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Barker; Excused, 1--Smith.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Hoyle, Nathanson; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson.
- Second reading.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
- Work Session held.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #3579
2/21/2014 1:03:13 PM
Amendment #3511
2/19/2014 1:19:59 PM
Amendment #3333
2/11/2014 3:42:36 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor