+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 110, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bynum, Meek. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/6/2018 3:55 PM)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor