+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Chapter 26, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barton. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Holvey.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 11, 2014 Calendar.
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor