+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 11, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Stark, Power. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/9/2018 10:58 AM)
+ − Sponsors (88)
Type:
Primary Sponsor