+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 47, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A7
Adopted (2/27/2018 5:55 PM)
Amendment -6
Adopted (2/7/2018 4:54 PM)