+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Chapter 7, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2018.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Linthicum declared potential conflict of interest.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward, Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Girod, Hansell; Excused, 1--Kruse.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 14--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Nearman, Reschke, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (17)
Amendment -9
Adopted (3/30/2018 2:06 PM)
Amendment -A24
Adopted (2/22/2018 12:48 PM)
Amendment -A23
Proposed (2/20/2018 1:00 PM)
Amendment -A12
Proposed (2/19/2018 10:11 AM)
Amendment -A11
Proposed (2/19/2018 10:11 AM)
Amendment -A13
Proposed (2/19/2018 10:11 AM)
Amendment -A15
Proposed (2/19/2018 4:47 PM)
Amendment -A17
Proposed (2/19/2018 4:47 PM)
Amendment -A14
Proposed (2/19/2018 10:11 AM)
Amendment A13
Proposed (2/19/2018 10:11:56 AM)
Amendment A14
Proposed (2/19/2018 10:11:56 AM)
Amendment A12
Proposed (2/19/2018 10:11:56 AM)
Amendment A11
Proposed (2/19/2018 10:11:56 AM)
Amendment -4
Combined (2/2/2018 5:02 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (1/31/2018 3:30:34 PM)
Amendment -2
Combined (2/8/2018 3:53 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (1/31/2018 3:30:34 PM)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor