+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/12/2018 4:48 PM)