+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (7)
Amendment -A13
Recommended (2/28/2020 10:57 AM)
Amendment -A14
Adopted (2/28/2020 10:57 AM)
Amendment -6
Adopted (2/13/2020 2:22 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/5/2020 10:02 AM)
Amendment -4
Combined (2/11/2020 2:48 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (2/5/2020 12:26 PM)
Amendment -3
Combined (2/13/2020 2:22 PM)