+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Chapter 68, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Boquist, Thatcher; excused, 2--Shields, Winters.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gallegos, Doherty. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Post, Stark, Weidner, Wilson; Excused, 2--McKeown, Nearman.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -6
Adopted (2/25/2016 1:53:57 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/24/2016 8:54:15 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/23/2016 4:42:12 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (2/23/2016 4:55:57 PM)