+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass, be referred to Rules, and then referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Informational Meeting scheduled.
- Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (7)
Amendment -13
Proposed (2/21/2018 4:47 PM)
Amendment -12
Proposed (2/20/2018 10:01 AM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (2/20/2018 10:01 AM)
Amendment -8
Proposed (2/20/2018 10:01 AM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (2/20/2018 10:01 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (2/9/2018 5:12 PM)
Amendment -5
Proposed (2/20/2018 10:01 AM)
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor