+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 8, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 641, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Gelser, Thatcher.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-18 by unanimous consent.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-17 by unanimous consent.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Whitsett, Lininger. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Read.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2015 Calendar.
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #6685
5/18/2015 11:30:25 AM
Amendment #6313
4/23/2015 12:00:10 PM