+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #2668
5/29/2013 10:19:09 AM
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor