+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.