+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2013 Calendar.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1734
Adopted