+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Chapter 226, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2015.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Clem, McLane.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2015 Calendar.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.