+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 443, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 18, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Esquivel, Hanna; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Buckley, Jenson.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Parrish. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2013 Calendar.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.