+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 18, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 725, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017.
On August 15, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Linthicum.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Parrish; Excused, 1--Boone.
On July 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to July 6, 2017 Calendar.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On July 3, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 18, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -8
Adopted (7/3/2017 4:02:12 PM)