+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 29, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 697, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted Conference Committee Report and repassed bill.Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Whitsett; excused, 1--Thomsen.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Repassed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Gelser, Kennemer, Thatcher, Weidner; Excused, 2--Barker, Smith.
- House adopted Conference Committee Report.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read in Senate.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Recommendation: House concur in Senate amendments dated June 3, 2013 and bill be further amended and repassed.
- Work Session held.
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators Beyer, Girod, Monroe appointed Senate conferees.
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Representatives Read, Chair; Bentz, Gorsek appointed House conferees.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- House refused to concur in Senate amendments.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 11--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Hansell, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Judiciary be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation, then Judiciary.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 16--Barton, Clem, Gelser, Gilliam, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Matthews, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett, Witt.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 23, 2013 Calendar.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #2896
Adopted
Amendment #2594
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor