+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 297, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boone, Meek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Ferrioli, Olsen.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-31 by unanimous consent.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-30 by unanimous consent.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Education by order of the President.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Nearman; Excused, 1--Heard; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Gomberg, Marsh, Smith G.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -A4
Proposed (5/23/2017 11:11:22 AM)
Amendment -A5
Adopted (5/23/2017 11:11:40 AM)
Amendment A4
Proposed (5/23/2017 11:11:22 AM)
Amendment A5
Proposed (5/23/2017 11:11:40 AM)
Amendment -A3
Proposed (5/22/2017 4:13:49 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/14/2017 8:39:09 AM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor