+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.