+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 220, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 1--Linthicum; excused, 4--Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Winters.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-24 by unanimous consent.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Possible Work Session cancelled.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Lininger, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Sanchez.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2017 Calendar.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Subsequent referral to Revenue rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Revenue be rescinded.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.