+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred. Ayes, 37; Nays, 20--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Boles, Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith G.
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2019 Calendar.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -A5
Adopted (6/13/2019 8:16 PM)
Amendment -A3
Recommended (6/7/2019 5:13 PM)
Amendment -A2
Recommended (6/7/2019 5:13 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/8/2019 11:20 AM)