+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #2753
Not Adopted