+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 60.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A6
Adopted (5/24/2017 12:25:28 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/11/2017 4:05:38 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/5/2017 8:19:56 AM)