+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 637, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
On July 27, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 12--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Smith G.
- Second reading.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/23/2021 11:25 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/31/2021 7:46 PM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (3/31/2021 7:45 PM)
Amendment -A5
Adopted (6/20/2021 12:59 PM)