+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 329, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Bentz, Cameron, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, McLane; Excused, 1--Fagan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #2213
Adopted
Amendment #1878
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor