+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #5463
4/13/2015 1:14:48 PM
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor