+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 288, (2013 Laws): Effective date June 4, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 41; Nays, 19--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Jenson, Krieger, McLane, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 7--Baertschiger, Ferrioli, George, Knopp, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Boquist, Starr.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education and Workforce Development.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 36; Nays, 24--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 25, 2013 Calendar.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.