+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 552, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 29, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 41; Nays, 14--Campos, Dexter, Fahey, Gomberg, Helm, Holvey, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Pham, Rayfield, Salinas, Sanchez, Sollman; Excused, 4--Hayden, Morgan, Smith G, Weber.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 2--Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 3--Heard, Manning Jr, Thatcher.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
- Work Session held.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session cancelled.
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Campos, Cate, Dexter, Gomberg, Hayden, Helm, Hudson, McLain, Nathanson, Pham, Rayfield, Salinas, Sanchez, Valderrama, Williams, Witt; Excused, 1--Prusak.
- Second reading.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -5
Proposed (6/11/2021 6:16 PM)
Amendment -6
Adopted (6/15/2021 8:26 AM)
Amendment -A11
Adopted (6/24/2021 12:05 PM)
Amendment -A7
Proposed (6/22/2021 9:06 AM)