+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 713, (2013 Laws): Effective date August 1, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 7, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Starr. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On June 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Gilliam; Excused, 1--Smith.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
- Referred to Rules.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #2885
Adopted
Amendment #1547
Adopted