+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #
5/11/2015 11:54:42 AM
Amendment #6556
5/11/2015 11:54:42 AM
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor