+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 12--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Whisnant; Excused, 4--Alonso Leon, Boone, Gorsek, Smith G.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 24, 2017 Calendar.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/10/2017 3:43:46 PM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor