+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter 404, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Lininger, McKeown.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2017 Calendar.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/4/2017 1:40:49 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/7/2017 9:20:02 AM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor