+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 226, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barton. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Gilliam, Gorsek, Hanna, Jenson, Speaker Kotek.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1924
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor