+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 374, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski, Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 19--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Heard, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng bill.
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng Minority) (Not concurring: Linthicum, Thatcher)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Post, Reschke; Excused, 2--Leif, Nearman.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 26, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 04-20 Calendar.
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on 04-16 Calendar.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar.
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/9/2021 2:27 PM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (3/24/2021 9:04 AM)
Amendment -AMR5
Proposed (5/25/2021 4:18 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/9/2021 10:54 AM)