+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Possible Work Session cancelled.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Findley.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2019 Calendar.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A9
Proposed (5/22/2019 8:55 AM)
Amendment -6
Adopted (4/8/2019 4:00 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/8/2019 4:00 PM)