+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 250, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Beyer.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Freeman, Hanna; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.