+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 25, 2021 in the House:
- Chapter 261, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 2--Girod, Heard; Excused, 8--Boquist, Findley, Frederick, Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 6--Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Boshart Davis, Nosse.
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2021 Calendar.
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 10, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/31/2021 1:36 PM)