+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 436, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
- Governor signed.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Dingfelder; excused, 1--Boquist.
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Krieger. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 4--Frederick, Gelser, Greenlick, Hicks.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1157
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor