+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to General Government.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/6/2021 11:03 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (4/12/2021 3:26 PM)