+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 6, 2015 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue by prior reference.
- Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Revenue.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #1773
4/16/2013 10:27:31 AM
Amendment #6174
4/20/2015 10:43:23 AM
Amendment #4879
3/30/2015 9:47:00 AM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor