+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Chapter 660, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 25, 2013.
- Governor signed.
On July 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 6, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 5--Boquist, George, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen.
On June 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Frederick.
- Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed.Ayes, 49; Nays, 9--Cameron, Frederick, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Olson, Thatcher, Weidner; Excused, 1--Smith; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bailey.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor