+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Chapter 446, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Governor signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 40; Nays, 19--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Sprenger.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Knopp; Excused, 1--Hansell.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-04 by unanimous consent.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading. Referred to President's desk.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
- Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 34; Nays, 24--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Clem, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Nearman, Smith G.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 24, 2019 Calendar.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (5/21/2019 1:38 PM)